KIDS R US COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Kidz R Us is an award-winning youth theatre company, dedicated to getting young people involved in the performing arts, to support their development and the wider community. Rave reviews and standing ovations are a bonus! We work with around 100 children, teenagers and young adults a year, and since 1994 have produced more than 100 shows and won numerous awards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 09 September 1998: Standard registration
- KIDZ R US (Working name)
- THE ST IVES THEATRE GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Joshua Richards | Trustee | 12 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Stickland | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Marie Skitt | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Hocking | Trustee | 16 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Sally Ward | Trustee | 06 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £251.23k | £79.21k | £185.91k | £263.38k | £196.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £230.38k | £92.39k | £178.22k | £241.49k | £289.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 AUGUST 1998
Charitable objects
THE STUDY AND PERFORMANCE OF THE ARTS OF MUSIC, DRAMA AND DANCING BY YOUNG PERSONS AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THOSE ARTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST IVES THEATRE
LOWER STENNACK
ST. IVES
CORNWALL
TR26 1QG
- Phone:
- 01736797007
- Email:
- info@kidzrus.net
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window