WILTSHIRE OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY AND HEALTH ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of networking available to members of the general public, small and medium/large businesses in the improvement of health, safety and environmental management at work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 01 October 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEREK JONATHAN BOULTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Paul Lewis Elling | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah-Jane French | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT LENTELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLAIRE EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5 | £5 | £362 | £1.20k | £1.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.12k | £898 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JULY 1999.
Charitable objects
A/ TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, WITHIN WILTSHIRE AND ADJACENT AREAS, HIGH STANDARDS OF OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH, SAFETY AND WELFARE. B/ TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF EMPLOYERS, EMPLOYEES AND THE SELF-EMPLOYED IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO HEALTH AND SAFETY AT WORK.
Area of benefit
WILTSHIRE AND ADJACENT AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Siemenss Mobility Limited
PO BOX 79
CHIPPENHAM
SN15 1JD
- Phone:
- 07921 246036
- Email:
- DEREK.BOULTON@SIEMENS.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window