PAPER WORKS (HARROGATE) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist people with learning and/or physical disabilities through educational and vocational training to encourage and enable them to find gainful employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 11 June 1999: Standard registration
- PAPERWORKS (HARROGATE) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Catherine Varley-Fodden | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lyndon Paul Cowling | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zahid Tarvaz | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Helen Overfield | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Baum | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £358.07k | £366.86k | £377.78k | £350.62k | £399.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £343.43k | £345.47k | £356.36k | £346.59k | £359.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £244.15k | £214.22k | £240.21k | £265.65k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £104.43k | N/A | £14.84k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 February 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 8 FEBRUARY 1994 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH LEARNING AND OR PHYSICAL DISABILITIES IN ANY MANNER WHICH IS NOW OR HEREAFTER DEEMED CHARITABLE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Paperworks (Harrogate) Ltd
Unit 5
Prospect Park
Limewood Approach
LEEDS
LS14 1NG
- Phone:
- 01133236000
- Email:
- ask@paperworks.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window