Accounts and annual returns PARK-WREKIN COLLEGE SCHOOL OF GYMNASTICS AND DANCE

Charity number: 1076301
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 25 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 25 January 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 15 January 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 16 January 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 01 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 01 September 2012 On Time