ALUM ROCK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 September 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 22 September 1998: Standard registration
- 24 October 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ARCA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/09/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 26 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 26 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 26 September 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 26 September 2004 | 01 March 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 September 2004 | 01 March 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JULY 1998
Charitable objects
PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS, THE WILLIAM SUTTON TRUST AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS RELIEVE SUCH OF THE SAID INHABITANTS WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED BY PROVIDING THEM WITH INFORMATION, ADVICE AND OTHER ASSISTANCE IN RESPECT OF ADVOCACY, REPRESENTATION, WELFARE RIGHTS, TRAINING, EMPLOYMENT AND OTHER MATTERS ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, OR OTHERWISE ACQUIRE, A COMMUNITY CENTRE PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED
Area of benefit
WILLIAM SUTTON TRUST ESTATE, ALUM ROCK, BIRMINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window