THE DURHAM PALESTINE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust seeks to aid the economic and social development of Palestine and to spread knowledge about Palestine in Durham area. We do this, principally, by offering, in conjunction with the University of Durham, scholarships for Masters courses at the University of Durham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 21 February 2001: Standard registration
- DPET (Working name)
- DURHAM PALESTINE EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Working name)
- THE DURHAM - PALESTINE EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR JUSTIN WILLIS | Chair | 30 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Professor Owain Smolovic-Jones | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Bahl | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Wood | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
NEIL GRIFFIN | Trustee | 30 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fadia Faqir | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HARROP | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE MALCOLM | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roger Reeve | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kamal Badreshany | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Penny Wilson | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|||||
Eileen Williamson | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr NATHAN GRIFFIN | Trustee | 08 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
VIN MCINTYRE | Trustee | 12 March 2001 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR BILL WILLIAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANE WILLIAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.06k | £36.71k | £166.86k | £191.64k | £162.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.83k | £30.66k | £42.71k | £94.88k | £153.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 23 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 23 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 09 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/05/2000 AS AMENDED ON 16/11/2006 AS AMENDED ON 02/12/2013
Charitable objects
1) TO ENABLE PALESTINIAN RESIDENTS OF THE WEST BANK OF THE RIVER JORDAN AND THE GAZA STRIP TO PURSUE EDUCATIONAL AND/OR TRAINING COURSES AT THE UNIVERSITY OF DURHAM 2) TO ENABLE STUDENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF DURHAM TO PURSUE EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AT UNIVERSITIES IN THE WEST BANK OR GAZA 3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AND STAFF OF THE UNIVERSITY OF DURHAM AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF THE CITY OF DURHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA ABOUT DEVELOPMENTS IN THE WEST BANK AND GAZA STRIP THAT AFFECT EDUCATION AND/OR TRAINING 4) TO PROMOTE ACADEMIC DEVELOPMENTS IN UNIVERSITIES IN THE WEST BANK AND GAZA STRIP AND TO PROMOTE LINKS AND ACADEMIC EXCHANGES BETWEEN THEM AND THE UNIVERSITY OF DURHAM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DPET
c/o Redhills: Durham Miners Hall
Flass Street
Durham
- Phone:
- 07570466087
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window