SHOPMOBILITY ST HELENS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shopmobility is a service where battery powered wheelchairs, scooters and manual wheelchairs are available to loan to adults and children with mobility impairments, whether temporary or permanent, to help with shopping or using other facilities the town has on offer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- St Helens
Governance
- 01 February 1999: Standard registration
- 15 January 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.84k | £101.84k | £103.68k | £84.93k | £5.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.41k | £91.77k | £88.27k | £27.77k | £7.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 06 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 11 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 25 September 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 19 December 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 19 December 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 10 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 10 January 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JULY 1998 AS AMENDED 6 JANUARY 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PEOPLE AND THEIR CARERS WITH A VIEW TO ENABLING SUCH PERSONS TO BECOME INTEGRATED WITHIN THE COMMUNITY
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF ST. HELENS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window