Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S

Charity number: 1073162
Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days
Annual return 05 April 2020 11 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required