Financial history ROYAL AIR FORCE MANSTON HISTORY MUSEUM ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1075396
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £58.74k £67.77k £62.27k £73.85k £26.94k
Total expenditure £59.94k £58.61k £50.72k £58.47k £25.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A