Financial history CANOLFAN CYNGHORI YNYS MON CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1074170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £530.11k £674.56k £1.09m £1.48m £1.55m
Total expenditure £518.27k £607.78k £894.13k £1.36m £1.51m
Income from government contracts £475.37k £506.81k £73.02k £1.12m £1.39m
Income from government grants £43.26k £104.15k £121.05k £351.41k £163.51k
Income - Donations and legacies £4.19k £50 £108 £632 £204
Income - Other trading activities £5.04k £7.51k £14.54k £6.67k £3.07k
Income - Charitable activities £518.62k £666.70k £1.07m £1.47m £1.54m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.26k £297 £161 £3.19k £13.25k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £518.27k £607.78k £894.13k £1.36m £1.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £12.16k £16.55k £13.99k £16.75k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0