Trustees CANOLFAN CYNGHORI YNYS MON CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1074170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Salisbury Chair 02 June 2016
None on record
Thelma Arianwen Parry Trustee 02 November 2023
None on record
Sara Closs-Davies Trustee 01 February 2022
None on record
Robert James Bonwick-Salisbury Trustee 29 April 2021
None on record
Alwyn Rowlands Trustee 04 August 2016
None on record
HUW EVANS Trustee
None on record