UNITED KINGDOM ASSOCIATION FOR MILK BANKING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
UKAMB is a charity that supports the promotion and use of milk screened according to Nice Clinical Guidance number 93 The aim of the charity is the formation of a National Screened Donor Breastmilk service that would supply infants throughout the UK according to need, not geographical location. The charity aims to support milk banks throughout the UK, by training and information sharing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 November 2000: Standard registration
- UKAMB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Atherton | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Simon Dyall | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH IRENE BARNETT RM RGN BSC | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHEL BANKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.80k | £14.07k | £5.47k | £1.88k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.44k | £6.75k | £13.18k | £5.34k | £364 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 467 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 November 2023 | 286 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 31/01/2011
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE IN ALL AREAS OF HUMAN MILK BANKING INCLUDING BEST PRACTICE GUIDANCE AND (B) THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH REGARDING HUMAN MILK BANKING AND ASSOCIATED SUBJECTS AND DISSEMINATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Neo Natal Unit
Birmingham Women's Hospital
Mindelsohn Way
Edgbaston
Birmingham
B15 2TG
- Phone:
- 0141 232 4006
- Email:
- info@ukamb.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window