Financial history VASARI SINGERS

Charity Number: 1071299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £43.49k £21.78k £33.51k £38.41k £34.84k
Total expenditure £40.13k £19.47k £38.65k £39.64k £28.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A