THE GARRICK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity focuses on the encouragement of theatre, music, literature and dance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 01 September 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARETH NEAME OBE, DL | Chair | 12 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
DAVE MURPHY | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
SIR. ROBERT W CHOTE | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
David Whelton OBE | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|||||||
JOSEPH HENRY LEWIN SEELIG OBE | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
JOHN RICHARD FRANCIS COLDSTREAM | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.34k | £39.23k | £22.07k | £25.10k | £76.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.87k | £232.76k | £234.29k | £280.80k | £285.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13TH AUGUST 1998
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE PROVIDE THAT THE TRUSTEES SHALL ALSO HAVE POWER IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES. (ALSO SEE CLAUSES 4.2 & 4.3)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
GARRICK CLUB
15 GARRICK STREET
LONDON
WC2E 9AY
- Phone:
- 02078361737
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window