ROOTS (ROCHDALE, HEYWOOD MIDDLETON ORGANISATION OF TENANT SUPPORT)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Rochdale
Governance
- 15 March 1999: Standard registration
- 17 September 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ROOTS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £519.58k | £500.98k | £581.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £459.48k | £550.06k | £585.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 18 February 2011 | 18 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 07 July 2010 | 157 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF ROCHDALE, AND THE FAMILIES OF SAID PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF DOMICILIARY SUPPORT WITH A VIEW TO ENABLING SAID PEOPLE TO LEAD A VALUED AND INDEPENDENT LIFESTYLE WITHIN THEIR OWN LOCALITY
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF ROCHDALE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window