THE HINGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWNS OF GOOLE AND BRIDLINGTON IN THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE, AND ITS ENVIRONS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 February 1999: Standard registration
- 11 April 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 11 April 2012: Funds transferred to 1146714 THE HINGE CENTRE LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.80k | £116.14k | £161.77k | £144.34k | £177.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.32k | £122.07k | £161.46k | £149.32k | £184.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 08 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 08 August 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 25 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | 25 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 15 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 30 October 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JULY 1997 AS AMENDED 22 JANUARY 1999, 21 MAY 2002 AND 18 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWNS OF GOOLE AND BRIDLINGTON IN THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE, AND ITS ENVIRONS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH, TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND THE DISTRESS ARISING THERE FROM.
Area of benefit
GOOLE AND BRIDLINGTON IN THE EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE, AND ITS ENVIRONS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window