Governing document INTERNATIONAL PSYCHOANALYTICAL ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1071752

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 21 JAN 1998, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 31 JUL 1998, 20 JAN 2007, CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 2 APRIL 2008 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 MAY 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP THE SCIENCE OF PSYCHOANALYSIS AND TO PROMOTE EDUCATION RELATING THERETO.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.