Financial history THE DENT MEDITATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1076345
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £45.19k £24.58k £12.33k £15.36k £19.55k
Total expenditure £38.77k £33.57k £30.53k £17.61k £15.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A