Financial history ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION KETTERING 508 BRANCH

Charity Number: 1071222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £549 £2.65k £7.89k £2.00k £1.98k
Total expenditure £729 £1.97k £3.97k £1.85k £5.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A