Trustees DOWNING COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137455
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

54 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROF GRAHAM JOHN VIRGO Chair
None on record
Dr Charlotte Christiane Hammer Trustee 05 February 2025
None on record
Dr Maria Elena Martinez-Acacio Alonso Trustee 31 January 2025
None on record
Simon Brockington Dr Trustee 04 November 2024
None on record
Dr YANG LI Trustee 04 October 2024
None on record
PROFESSOR ALISON DEIRDRE JANE SCADDEN Trustee 04 October 2024
None on record
PROFESSOR EMMA FRANCIS INGLIS LEES Trustee 04 October 2024
None on record
DR DINO KADICH Trustee 04 October 2024
None on record
Giulia Maltagliati Trustee 03 May 2024
None on record
Juliana Santos de Carvalho Trustee 09 February 2024
None on record
Dr STEFANIA FIORENTINO Trustee 02 October 2023
REGIONAL STUDIES ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
DR RACHEL COOMBES Trustee 02 October 2023
None on record
DR REBECCA FREUND Trustee 02 October 2023
None on record
Dr ALICE SOWTON Trustee 02 October 2023
None on record
Dr Bonnie Claire Lander Johnson Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Professor Helen Jane Scott Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dr Maria Vera Morales Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dmitrij Szamozvancev Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dr Francesco Muschitiello Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Robert Todd Beardwell Trustee 11 March 2022
None on record