CUMBERLAND BUILDING SOCIETY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making donations for the benefit of persons living within the Society's operating region (Cumbria, Dumfriesshire, Preston, Lancaster, Haltwhistle). To make a relatively large number of small donations across the whole of the operating region, with a view to reaching local community groups, where often small donations of funds can have significant impacts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- Northumberland
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 November 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kelly Jane Ashbridge | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Emma Frances Smith | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lyndsay Maxwell | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Marion Cape | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Benson | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.41k | £23.88k | £22.37k | £24.64k | £24.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.41k | £23.88k | £22.37k | £24.64k | £24.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 07 OCT 2019
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CUMBERLAND HOUSE
COOPER WAY
PARKHOUSE
CARLISLE
CUMBRIA
CA3 0JF
- Phone:
- 01228403141
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window