HOMESHARE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's activities consist of finding suitable homeshare volunteers to live in the home of an older person, person with disabilities, or person with long term health problems, with the aim of providing companionship, security and practical help around the home. Homeshare supports resulting matches throughout the duration of the match arrangement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 September 1998: Standard registration
- 31 January 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LONDON CARE CONNECTIONS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/01/2008 | 31/01/2009 | 31/01/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.66k | £119.93k | £102.29k | £119.24k | £139.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.11k | £123.59k | £83.21k | £126.78k | £131.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2010 | 18 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2010 | 18 November 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20TH AUGUST1998 AS AMENDED 9TH JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE AND PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL IMPAIRMENT BY IDENTIFYING, TRAINING AND SUPPORTING CARERS WHO WILL ENABLE THE CARED FOR PERSONS TO REMAIN LIVING IN THEIR OWN HOMES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window