TOWER HAMLETS COMMUNITY HOUSING LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tower Hamlets Community Housing is a social landlord. THCH was formed in March 2000 with Government funding of 21million secured from Round 3 of the Estates Renewal Challenge Fund for the transfer of 1249 homes owned by the London Borough of Tower Hamlets. THCH has continued to grow through prudent local authority transfers and building new homes for social rent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Total income:
£25,435,000
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £17.74m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £151.00k | |
Other | £7.54m |
Total expenditure:
£18,851,000
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £18.85m | |
Other | £0 |
£100 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £18.85m | |
Retained for future use | £6.58m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £18.85m | |
Retained for future use | £6.58m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 30 November 1999: Standard registration
- 19 January 2019: Removed (Exempt charity)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.08m | £25.99m | £22.11m | £24.87m | £25.44m | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.19m | £16.86m | £17.52m | £20.71m | £18.85m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £17.08m | £25.99m | £22.11m | £22.02m | £17.74m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £232.00k | £151.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.62m | £7.54m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £14.19m | £16.86m | £17.52m | £20.71m | £18.85m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £58.00k | £10.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £85.60m | £85.55m | £87.63m | £162.74m | £165.84m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £11.00k | £11.00k | |
|
Other assets | £9.72m | £8.49m | £9.36m | £12.86m | £14.89m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.90m | -£1.82m | -£2.84m | -£2.91m | -£1.64m | |
|
Total liabilities | £78.08m | £70.31m | £69.44m | £72.12m | £72.32m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 05 December 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 05 December 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 26 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 26 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 02 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 02 October 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/06/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/10/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/07/2015 as amended on 03 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
(1) PROVIDING HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; (11) PROVIDING FOR AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; (111) PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALITY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF IN ARRANGING OR CARRYING OUT WORKS OF IMPROVEMENT, REPAIR OR MAINTENANCE TO HOUSES OCCUPIED BY THEM, AND PROVIDING ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS. (1V) THE PROVISION OF RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE ASSOCIATION OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS. (V) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE ASSOCIATION OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK AND NEIGHBOURING LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS. (V1) SUPPORTING ANY CHARITABLE ORGANISATION CARRYING ON ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE ASSOCIATION OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK AND NEIGHBOURING LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS. "HOUSES" AND "HOSTELS" SHALL HAVE THE MEANINGS GIVEN BY SECTION 106 OF THE HOUSING ASSOCIATIONS ACT 1985 AND SHALL INCLUDE BLOCKS OF FLATS WITHIN THE MEANING OF SECTION 42 OF THE HOUSING ACT 1996.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window