Accounts and annual returns MERCY AND MEDICAL INTERNATIONAL AID

Charity number: 1073388
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 April 2021 10 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 18 April 2020 20 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 18 April 2019 27 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 18 April 2018 07 September 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 April 2018 Not Required