INSTITUTE FOR CHILDREN, YOUTH AND MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity of the Institute for Children, Youth and Mission, in promoting both the Christian faith and education, is to provide training courses, with appropriate validation and accreditation, to undertake research and produce publications to support Christian work with young people, children, families, schools and communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 15 June 2000: Standard registration
- CYM (Working name)
- CENTRE FOR YOUTH MINISTRY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Ernest Gregory | Chair | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Michael Greene | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Kathryn Leveson | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|||||
AMIE M'BALU BUHARI | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alasdair James Campbell | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barry Leslie Thompson | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Craig Langton | Trustee | 26 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £470.53k | £494.48k | £290.58k | £194.83k | £399.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £428.95k | £408.81k | £291.16k | £288.38k | £278.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/03/2013 as amended on 23 Apr 2018 as amended on 23 Apr 2018 as amended on 23 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THE CREATION AND PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN YOUTH WORK TRAINING AND RESOURCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Commerce Square
Lace Market
Nottingham
NG1 1HS
- Phone:
- 01157770102
- Email:
- enquiries@cym.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window