THE BASEMENT STUDIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Basement Studio targets social exclusion by providing youth work and music opportunities for 11 to 25 year olds in Bristol.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £1,396 from 3 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 04 March 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AIMEE MUKHERJEE | Chair | 09 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Craig Williams | Trustee | 01 April 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.20k | £40.05k | £30.59k | £31.56k | £21.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.76k | £45.43k | £33.49k | £28.67k | £22.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £28.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 848 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 March 2022 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A YOUTH MUSIC TRAINING AND INFORMATION RESOURCE FOR MARGINALISED YOUNG PEOPLE THAT COMBINES PROFESSIONAL YOUTH WORK PRACTICE WITH TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES IN MUSIC, MUSIC TECHNOLOGY, SOUND RECORDING AND RADIO PRODUCTION
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. BATH AND BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE STATION
SILVER STREET
BRISTOL
BS1 2AG
- Phone:
- 07784935956
- Email:
- troy@basementstudio.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window