FRIENDS OF WATLINGTON LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the use of Library & supporting Librarians by:- 1. Develop co-operation between Library & Community. 2. Facilitate communication between local people, Library & County. 3. Encourage young people to use Library. 4. Recruit & help organise volunteers for specific purposes. 5. Fund raising & sponsorship . 6. Helping to safeguard the future of Library & develop innovations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 17 November 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR Anna Margaret Tilley | Chair | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
James Thomas Clarke | Trustee | 10 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Suzanne Polkinghorne | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Karen Jane Cemm | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Shaw | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Hancock | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|||||
HELEN CLAIRE SPEIRS | Trustee | 16 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIA HEYWORTH | Trustee | 16 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
THERESA PAMELA KNIGHT | Trustee | 01 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Philip George Pinney | Trustee | 09 May 2008 |
|
|
||||
DIANA JOY YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RENEE GRASSBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.35k | £5.01k | £6.96k | £9.63k | £12.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.09k | £1.39k | £3.82k | £10.95k | £8.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13TH OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF WATLINGTON LIBRARY, THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF THE GROUP OF FRIENDS
Area of benefit
WATLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
52a Brook Street
WATLINGTON
OX49 5EH
- Phone:
- 01491612926
- Website:
-
friendsofwatlingtonlibrary.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window