Accounts and annual returns PWLL Y PANT VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1072504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 February 2025 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 February 2025 376 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 February 2025 741 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 February 2025 1106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1568 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1568 days