Financial history PWLL Y PANT VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1072504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.57k £7.43k £25.81k £7.01k £6.54k
Total expenditure £7.18k £7.03k £25.76k £6.88k £6.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £24.00k N/A N/A