WEEDON OLD SCHOOLROOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of the parish of Weedon in Bucinghamshire without distinction of political, religious, or other opinions, including use for meetings, lectures and classes, and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupations, with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 18 December 1998: Standard registration
- WEEDON OLD SCHOOLROOM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNA ROSE | Chair |
|
||||||
sarah Finch Gibbs Mrs | Trustee | 24 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alan William askew | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Birks | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Amanda Stevens | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anne V Redstone | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Jones | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY BUSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ASKEW | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.71k | £13.23k | £11.30k | £6.76k | £5.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.76k | £5.74k | £5.16k | £15.87k | £8.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £9.77k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 1ST AUGUST 1998
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WEEDON IN THE COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
WEEDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 HIGH STREET
WEEDON
AYLESBURY
HP22 4NW
- Phone:
- 01296641355
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window