Accounts and annual returns THE BLACKHEATH CONSERVATOIRE OF MUSIC AND THE ARTS LTD

Charity number: 1072627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 08 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 08 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 28 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 11 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 11 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 04 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 27 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window