Accounts and annual returns ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION COLCHESTER BRANCH

Charity number: 1071533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 03 February 2025 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 February 2025 461 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 February 2023 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 March 2022 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 April 2021 170 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required