TREDAVOE CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Christian Chapel and Village School Room
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 31 July 2002: Standard registration
- TREDAVOE CHAPEL TRUST FUNDS (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phillippa Clair COOK | Chair | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Alcock | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Fair | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Alexander Packham | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Moon | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Alcock | Trustee | 17 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ross Simon Williams | Trustee | 10 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brian Michael STANLEICK | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.24k | £920 | £8.29k | £3.67k | £3.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.48k | £2.45k | £2.94k | £6.24k | £2.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 November 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2022 | 319 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2022 | 684 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 FEBRUARY 2002.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP AND SUNDAY SCHOOL ROOM.
Area of benefit
THE PENZANCE AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chy Lorgan
Tredavoe
Newlyn
Penzance
Select
TR20 8TW
- Phone:
- 01736361332
- Email:
- suemoonshine56@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window