ATALANTA'S FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants for sportswomen at Oxford University
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 08 March 1999: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr AMELIA GEORGIANA VAN MANEN | Chair | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Leah Ann Mary McHugh | Trustee | 09 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Preece | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hannah McKay | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.30k | £1.30k | £1.30k | £718 | £695 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.09k | £845 | £845 | £0 | £1 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 FEBRUARY 1999
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF WOMEN UNDERGRADUATE AND POSTGRADUATE STUDENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD. 2 THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Freehold Street
Lower Heyford
BICESTER
Oxfordshire
OX25 5NT
- Phone:
- 07557350031
- Email:
- Atalantastrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window