CORAM FAMILY AND CHILDCARE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Coram Family and Childcare works to make the UK a better place for families by bringing together what we learn from our on the ground parent-led programmes and our to research to advocate for solutions that parents want and need. We focus on childcare and early years to make a difference to families' lives now and in the long term.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £103,101 from 2 government contract(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 September 1999: Standard registration
- 11 August 2015: Funds received from 327279 DAYCARE TRUST
- FAMILY AND PARENTING INSTITUTE (Working name)
- FAMILY AND CHILDCARE TRUST (Previous name)
- NATIONAL FAMILY AND PARENTING INSTITUTE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL CURRAN | Chair | 01 August 2018 |
|
|||||||
Ade Labinjo | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sarah Rance | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Liz Roberts | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Sharon Harris | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Yolanda William | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Holly Robinson | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Charlotte Faircloth | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Judith Trowell FRCPsych | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £425.98k | £502.07k | £416.19k | £375.80k | £466.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £400.60k | £371.34k | £422.46k | £385.08k | £402.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £147.12k | £146.60k | £34.21k | £103.10k | |
|
Income from government grants | £107.74k | £7.18k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £2.11k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £492.68k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £136 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £7.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £337.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £34.11k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £7.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/04/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/09/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/12/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE, PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND WELFARE OF AND TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND HARDSHIP OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PERSONS, PARENTS AND PERSONS INVOLVED IN ALL FORMS OF FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS BY:- A) ENCOURAGING AGENCIES INVOLVED IN PROVIDING RELATIONSHIP SUPPORT AND SUPPORT FOR PARENTS AND CHILDREN TO WORK TOGETHER MORE EFFECTIVELY; B) PROMOTING GOOD PARENTING PRACTICE AND SKILLS; C) ASSISTING FAMILIES AND PROSPECTIVE PARENTS IN THE CARE, UPBRINGING AND EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE; IN THEIR ADULT RELATIONSHIPS; IN DEALING WITH ISSUES RELATING TO THE CREATION AND BREAKDOWN OF FAMILY UNITS; AND IN RELATIONSHIPS WITHIN EXTENDED FAMILIES; 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILDCARE AND TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN AND SUPPORT FACILITIES AND SCHEMES FOR THE CARE RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN INCLUDING CHILDREN WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES OR SCHEMES BY VIRTUE OF THEIR OR THEIR CARERS’ YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM SUCH FACILITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED. 3) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN PARENTING SKILLS AND THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS AND EVALUATING THE IMPACT OF SUCH EDUCATION AND TRAINING; 4) TO CONDUCT OR COMMISSION RESEARCH INTO THE DEMOGRAPHIC, ECONOMIC, SOCIAL, HEALTH AND OTHER FACTORS INFLUENCING CONTEMPORARY FAMILY LIFE, THE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN PARENTS, PROSPECTIVE PARENTS, PARENTS AND CHILDREN AND RELATED SUBJECTS AND DISSEMINATING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH TO THE PUBLIC; AND 5) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. PROVIDED THAT IN PURSUING THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY REGARD SHALL BE HAD AT ALL TIMES TO THE DIFFERING FAMILY FORUMS, TRADITIONS AND PRACTICES WHICH EXIST IN GREAT BRITAIN AS A MULTI-CULTURAL SOCIETY. THROUGHOUT THESE ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ‘CHARITABLE’ MEANS CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES PROVIDED THAT IT WILL NOT INCLUDE ANY PURPOSE WHICH IS NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005. FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT, THE SYSTEM OF LAW GOVERNING THE CONSTITUTION OF THE CHARITY IS THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coram Campus
41 Brunswick Square
London
WC1N 1AZ
- Phone:
- 020 7239 7535
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window