Helping Herts Homeless

Charity number: 1071610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Owner of a hostel which provides basic accommodation for relieving homelessness in North Hertfordshire. Acts as a hub and donates funds to support the work of other charities involved in supporting the homeless in Hertfordshire.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £59,886
Total expenditure: £35,534

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 September 1998: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • HELPING HERTS HOMELESS (Previous name)
  • NORTH HERTS SANCTUARY (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Bridge Trustee 30 May 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Poole Trustee 30 May 2023
None on record
Owain Paul Lister Trustee 06 December 2022
None on record
Ian Paul Chapman Trustee 05 September 2016
None on record
peter warren Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £41.99k £37.86k £39.25k £33.58k £59.89k
Total expenditure £34.27k £28.69k £33.23k £18.87k £35.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 02 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 02 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 02 July 2024 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 02 July 2024 63 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 26 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 26 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 30 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 30 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 05 July 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 05 July 2021 66 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o H W Associates
Portmill House
Portmill Lane
HITCHIN
Herts
SG5 1DJ
Phone:
01462600425