KOL YA'AKOV EDGWARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of synagogue and prayer facilities and Jewish educational programs in Edgware.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barnet
Governance
- 02 December 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel Rosethal | Trustee | 16 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julian Yehuda Teller | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aryeh Royde | Trustee | 13 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.28k | £79.61k | £90.88k | £120.80k | £129.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.31k | £77.16k | £96.34k | £120.40k | £127.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24TH AUGUST 1998
Charitable objects
(A) FOR AND TOWARDS THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH EDUCATION IN EDGWARE AND ELSEWHERE IN PARTICULAR IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ORTHODOX TRADITION BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE SYNAGOGUE OF KOL YA'AKOV EDGWARE AND ITS SATELLITE SYNAGOGUES, (B) FOR AND TOWARDS THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE JEWISH RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ORTHODOX TRADITION BY THE CREATION OF SCHOLARSHIPS TO BE AWARDED TO MEMBERS OF THE ORTHODOX COMMUNITY IN EDGWARE AND ELSEWHERE. (C) FOR AND TOWARDS SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM PROPER.
Area of benefit
EDGWARE AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Mowbray Road
EDGWARE
HA8 8JL
- Phone:
- 02089510333
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window