ANNA PLOWDEN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grants to individuals and organisations in connection with training in skills and awareness of conservation of the man made heritage
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 November 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Isobel Margaret Griffin | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hippisley- Cox | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Puneeta Sharma | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina Rozeik | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Lucy Weiss | Trustee | 06 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE CHRISTINA MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE GRANT MCAUSLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr DAVID LEIGH | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr DAVID RAY SAUNDERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £121.08k | £93.47k | £90.22k | £105.27k | £113.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.02k | £95.21k | £85.44k | £69.13k | £96.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21ST AUGUST 1998, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 7TH OCTOBER 1998.
Charitable objects
A) TO CONSERVE RESTORE AND MAINTAIN FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND THEREBY TO SAVE FOR FUTURE GENERATIONS FURNITURE, PICTURE, HISTORIC RECORDS, BOOKS, MANUSCRIPTS, MUNIMENTS, ARMOUR, PORCELAIN, SILVER AND GOLD OBJECTS D'ART, STATUES AND OTHER CHATTELS OR ITEMS OF NATIONAL, HISTORIC, ARCHITECTURAL, OR ARTISTIC OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST, INCLUDING ANY ANCILLARY BUILDINGS. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ENCOURAGING KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THEM TO ACQUIRE SKILLS IN THE RESTORATION AND CONSERVATION OF SUCH OBJECTS OR BUILDINGS OF NATIONAL, HISTORIC, ARCHITECTURAL OR ARTISTIC OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST AND IMPORTANCE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: I) THE CREATION, MAINTENANCE AND FUNDING GRANTS, BURSARIES, SCHOLARSHIPS, PRIZES AND AWARDS; II)THE CREATION, MAINTENANCE AND FUNDING GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS; AND III)THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE PROVISION OF ACCESS TO AND STUDY OF SUCH OBJECTS AND BUILDINGS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 HIGHBURY ROAD
LONDON
SW19 7PR
- Phone:
- 02088799841
- Email:
- info@annaplowdentrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window