Trustees 35TH NORWICH SEA SCOUTS
Charity number: 1071584

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deane Money | Chair | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Mulcahy | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jason Drake | Trustee | 14 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Walker | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tina Herrington | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Graham Leigh | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN ARTHUR TUCKER | Trustee | 28 May 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.