RAF HONINGTON & BARNHAM KINDERGARTEN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AN ESTABLISHED DAY NURSERY (OFSTED REGISTERED), IN A PURPOSE-DESIGNED BUILDING ACCOMMODATING A MAXIMUM OF 75 CHILDREN AT A TIME, PROVIDING PRE-SCHOOL CARE FOR CHILDREN AGED 0 TO 5 AND BEFORE/AFTER SCHOOL CARE FOR 5 TO 12 YEAR-OLDS. THE CENTRE, WHICH IS LOCATED ON MINISTRY OF DEFENCE PROPERTY, PRIMARILY SERVES ARMED FORCES DEPENDANTS AT RAF HONINGTON ASWELL AS THE SURROUNDING CIVILIAN COMMUNITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 15 September 1998: Standard registration
- 09 January 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 09 January 2015: Funds transferred to 288285 4CHILDREN
- FIRST STEPS (Working name)
- FIRST STEPS DAY CARE CENTRE (Working name)
- HONINGTON COMMUNITY CHILDCARE FACILITY (Working name)
- RAF HONNINGTON & BARNHAM KINDERGARTEN (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2009 | 31/10/2010 | 31/10/2011 | 31/10/2012 | 31/10/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £345.62k | £416.58k | £449.64k | £404.76k | £356.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £310.62k | £320.50k | £365.93k | £346.50k | £770.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2013 | 01 September 2014 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2013 | 13 August 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2012 | 01 September 2014 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2012 | 27 September 2013 | 27 days late | |
Annual return | 31 October 2011 | 01 September 2014 | 731 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2011 | 07 September 2012 | 7 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JULY 1998
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE, BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS.
Area of benefit
HONNINGTON & BARNHAM, SUFFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window