Trustees LIQUORICE PARK MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST
Charity Number: 1071634

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Robin Cragg | Chair | 29 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Melanie-Anne Marsh | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Royle | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bayles | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Penny Toone | Trustee | 25 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Griffiths | Trustee | 02 July 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.