LEICESTERSHIRE WILDLIFE HOSPITAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE CARE & TREATMENT OF SICK INJURED AND ORPHANED WILDLIFE FROM BRITAIN. WE ARE ALSO IN THE PROCESS OF RAISING FUNDS TO PROVIDE A PURPOSE BUILT HOSPITAL WHICH WILL USE AS MANY ECO FRIENDLY ENERGY SAVING SYSTEMS AS POSSIBLE TO INCLUDE USE OF RECYCLED WATER AND WASTE COMPOSTING SYSTEMS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 10 January 2000: Standard registration
- LEICESTERSHIRE WILDLIFE HOSPITAL (Working name)
- LEICESTERSHIRE WILDLIFE RESCUE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANGELA ELIZABETH downham | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MR L ELLINGWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUZANNE ELLINGWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER JAMES downham | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.98k | £100.88k | £175.00k | £109.98k | £91.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.15k | £126.50k | £133.81k | £125.20k | £140.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 NOVEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS AND BIRDS OF ANY SPECIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A WILDLIFE HOSPITAL B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF WILDLIFE AND IN METHODS OF ANIMAL CARE.
Area of benefit
LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Rookery Close
Kibworth Beauchamp
Kibworth
LEICESTER
LE8 0SD
- Phone:
- 07951285366
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window