WORCESTERSHIRE ASSOCIATION OF CARERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worcestershire Association of Carers is an independent source of information, advice and support for all adult carers of all client groups in Worcestershire. The Association aims to relieve the stresses experienced by informal carers and those they care for in the county of Worcestershire, through the provision of information and support services and the promotion of the needs of carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,332,530
Donations and legacies | £4.94k | |
Charitable activities | £1.24m | |
Other trading activities | £81.11k | |
Investments | £5.14k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,371,714
Raising funds | £74.90k | |
Charitable activities | £1.30m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £773,864 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £74.90k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.30m |
People

53 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 06 October 1998: Standard registration
- WAC (Working name)
- WAOC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Sullivan | Chair | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Marie Harrison | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Sally-Ann Albertine Lovett | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Srinivas Niranjan Koduri | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Patricia Taylor | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Mann | Trustee | 14 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
COLIN PETER ARCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £987.75k | £1.12m | £1.16m | £1.30m | £1.33m | |
|
Total expenditure | £875.48k | £962.96k | £1.11m | £1.38m | £1.37m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £698.00k | £666.23k | £702.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £19.50k | £15.00k | £17.38k | £792.78k | £773.86k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £16.67k | £39.39k | £8.52k | £7.29k | £4.94k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £82.43k | £25.36k | £72.43k | £82.12k | £81.11k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £888.35k | £1.05m | £1.08m | £1.21m | £1.24m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £309 | £138 | £8 | £2.02k | £5.14k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £500 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £792.95k | £891.63k | £1.04m | £1.31m | £1.30m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £82.53k | £71.34k | £67.83k | £65.97k | £74.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £4.98k | £4.96k | £6.52k | £5.23k | £5.21k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £37.15k | £21.60k | £22.35k | £30.96k | £25.06k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £252.45k | £435.87k | £475.00k | £395.31k | £370.18k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £53.97k | £66.61k | £54.28k | £60.41k | £68.57k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 DECEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 11 JUNE 1998, 28 SEPTEMBER 2000, 27 SEPTEMBER 2001 AND 12 SEPTEMBER 2003. as amended on 17 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS AND PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENT WITHIN THE FAMILY OR HOME IN THE COUNTY OF WORCESTERSHIRE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION SERVICES, SUPPORT CENTRES AND THE PROMOTION OF THE NEEDS OF CARERS
Area of benefit
WORCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Polysec House
Blackpole Trading Estate West
Hindlip
Worcester
WR3 8TJ
- Phone:
- 01905751340
- Email:
- mail@carersworcs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window