Trustees WORCESTERSHIRE ASSOCIATION OF CARERS
Charity number: 1071850

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Sullivan | Chair | 03 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Marie Harrison | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Sally-Ann Albertine Lovett | Trustee | 08 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Srinivas Niranjan Koduri | Trustee | 10 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Patricia Taylor | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Mann | Trustee | 14 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
COLIN PETER ARCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.