BINFIELD BADGER GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The group aims to improve the protection of badgers across Berkshire by promoting awareness via newsletters, regular meetings, attendance at local events and giving talks in Berkshire and the surrounding area. The Group also monitors badger activity at a number of setts across Berkshire and liaises with Councils on any proposals which may have an impact on badgers and their habitat.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bracknell Forest
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 08 June 1999: Standard registration
- 09 August 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 01 September 2011: Re-registered
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN FENNELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Trevor William Samuel | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Holwill | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Irene Samuel | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen McCoy | Trustee | 05 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jill Hoblin | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH DARNELL | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL COON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.07k | £3.53k | £3.64k | £3.56k | £3.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.01k | £8.07k | £3.08k | £1.92k | £3.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 03 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 December 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 29TH APRIL 1999
Charitable objects
THE PROTECTION AND CONSERVATION OF BADGERS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Area of benefit
BERKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Binfield Badger Group
c/o Unit 38 Suttons Business Park
Suttons Park Avenue
Reading
Berkshire
RG6 1AZ
- Phone:
- 08448041146
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window