ELMBRIDGE U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Elmbridge U3A provides men and women, no longer in full-time employment with the opportunity to join like-minded people in a variety of interests, educational and recreational, at minimal cost.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
125 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 15 September 1998: Standard registration
- 19 December 2023: Funds received from 1098804 SPELTHORNE U3A
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Edward Cudby | Chair | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Donin | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Warren | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Alistair Jeremy ANDREW | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barry Michael Peters | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phillipa Jane Allison | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Leslie Dowdney | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola June Lindsey | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Meg James | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CRAIG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.45k | £24.23k | £40.03k | £79.09k | £82.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.66k | £22.59k | £37.02k | £64.89k | £77.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 14 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 26 MARCH 1998, AS AMENDED 21ST MARCH 2003
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN THE BOROUGH OF ELMBRIDGE AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY; (2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR FOR MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE WHO ARE NOT IN FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT IN THE BOROUGH OF ELMBRIDGE AND ITS LOCALITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF ELMBRIDGE AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SANCTUARY
21 MATHAM ROAD
EAST MOLESEY
KT8 0SX
- Phone:
- 02089791719
- Email:
- treasurer@elmbridgeu3a.org
- Website:
-
u3asites.org.uk/elmbridge
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window