Financial history EASTHAM RAKE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity Number: 1071801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £4.05k £1.06k £3.29k £3.28k £3.92k
Total expenditure £3.97k £1.65k £3.58k £3.26k £4.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A