NORTH WEST KENT MUSLIM ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(A) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF ISLAM. (C) TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS. AND; (D) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 10 February 1999: Standard registration
- NWKMA (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LUTHFUL WAHED | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SYED SHAMSUL Alam | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MA MUNIM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.51k | £124.33k | £63.78k | £61.07k | £104.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.95k | £157.34k | £61.06k | £24.68k | £89.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 16 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 381 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 381 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 May 2024 | 395 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 May 2024 | 395 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 09 August 2022 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 09 August 2022 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 August 2022 | 466 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 09 August 2022 | 466 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 18 DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC ESPECIALLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH WEST KENT (WHICH SHALL INCLUDE DARTFORD, CRAYFORD, SWANLEY, BEXLEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS) AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE INHABITANTS WHO ARE MUSLIMS:-A) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TENETS AND DOCTRINES OF ISLAM. (C) TO RELIEVE MUSLIMS AND OTHERS WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS. AND; (D) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NORTH WEST KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTH WEST KENT MUSLIM ASSOCIATION
6O CRAYFORD HIGH STREET
DARTFORD
DA1 4EF
- Phone:
- 01322552857
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window