LIFELINE ENERGY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mission: Lifeline Energy helps vulnerable people transform their lives using sustainable, self-sufficient and environmentally friendly technologies, particularly media players, radios, lights and solar panels. Programmes: Lifeline Energy works mainly in sub-Saharan Africa in six key focus areas: education, health, agriculture, complex emergencies, peacemaking and economic development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Burundi
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Haiti
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Niger
- Rwanda
- South Africa
- Sudan
- Tanzania
- Zambia
Governance
- 27 October 2003: Standard registration
- 28 February 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FREEPLAY FOUNDATION (Working name)
- FREEPLAY FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £436.04k | £353.89k | £547.04k | £552.42k | £400.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £493.75k | £388.44k | £552.56k | £612.38k | £500.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £167.87k | £521.47k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £346.95k | £30.95k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £52 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £32.17k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £481.36k | £582.52k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £9.22k | £5.22k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £33.10k | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 09 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | 22 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 03 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 29 September 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 SEPTEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 26 SEPTEMBER 2003. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 1 APRIL 2010.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS, FAMINE AND SUFFERING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD (INCLUDING STARVATION, SICKNESS OR ANY DISABILITY) BY:- 1. SUPPORTING PROJECTS WHICH PROVIDE SELF-POWERED RADIOS TO THE WORLD'S POOREST COMMUNITIES, PARTICULARLY IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES, IN ORDER TO ACCESS INFORMATION AND EDUCATIONAL MATERIAL; AND 2. CARRYING OUT RESEARCH ON THE ROLE AND VALUE OF COMMUNICATIONS, RADIO BROADCASTING AND SELF POWERED ENERGY EQUIPMENT IN FURTHERING THOSE PURPOSES AND DISSEMINATING THE RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH WITH THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
FOR THOSE IN NEED IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window