THE KAOS ORGANISATION

Charity Number: 1080310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity runs workshops for children in drama and music and runs a Deaf Choir

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £14,288
Total expenditure: £11,303

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 April 2000: Standard registration
  • 16 May 2025: Funds received from 262517 THE ROTARY CLUB OF ISLINGTON, HIGHGATE AND MUSWELL...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROSEMARY JANE LACEY Chair
None on record
Adrienne Barr Trustee 08 May 2017
None on record
Beatrice Ray Trustee 08 May 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £25.59k £8.20k £1.63k £10.56k £14.29k
Total expenditure £25.55k £6.41k £2.73k £11.21k £11.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
72 CLARENCE ROAD
LONDON
N22 8PW
Phone:
02088816750